MD SB323 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Continuing the requirement that the Office of Legislative Audits conduct audits of local school systems by requiring the Office to conduct an audit of each local school system at least once every 6 years.
Title
Office of Legislative Audits - Auditing Local School Systems
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-03-28 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | |
2010-03-27 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-27 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-01 | Favorable Report by Appropriations | |
2010-03-10 | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-01 | First Reading Appropriations | |
2010-04-01 | Returned Passed | |
2010-02-26 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2010-02-24 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-02-24 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-02-23 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2010-02-03 | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-28 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Auditors and Audits
Education, Boards of
Legislative Services, Department of
Public Schools
Auditors and Audits
Education, Boards of
Legislative Services, Department of
Public Schools