MD SB319 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 420
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 420
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Transit Administration to provide ridership services on transit vehicles to any permanent employee in any unit of the Executive Branch of State government, including a unit with an independent personnel system; prohibiting the Administration from collecting fees or reimbursement for certain transit services; and requiring the Maryland Department of Transportation and the Department of Budget and Management to report to certain committees of the General Assembly on the cost and feasibility of expanding the program.
Title
Maryland Transit Administration – State Employees – Free Ridership (Transit Benefit for State Employees)
Sponsors
Sen. Malcolm Augustine [D] | Sen. Sarah Elfreth [D] | Sen. Brian Feldman [D] | Sen. Antonio Hayes [D] |
Sen. Benjamin Kramer [D] | Sen. William Smith [D] | Sen. Mary Washington [D] | Sen. Craig Zucker [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (99-38) (Y: 99 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (31-14) (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (31-14) (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 420 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (99-38) |
2019-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-02 | House | Floor Amendment {803122/1 (Delegate Ghrist) Withdrawn |
2019-04-02 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-02 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2019-03-05 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-26 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (31-14) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Floor Amendment {723823/1 (Senator Augustine) Adopted |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {387479/1 Finance Report Adopted |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {387479/1 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Baltimore City
Baltimore County
Budget and Management, Department of
Buses
Collective Bargaining
Commuters
Fees
Mass Transit
Railroads
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Transportation, Department of
Baltimore County
Budget and Management, Department of
Buses
Collective Bargaining
Commuters
Fees
Mass Transit
Railroads
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Transportation, Department of