MD SB300 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 9
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing certain employees to sue to recover the difference between certain prevailing wage rates and certain amounts under certain circumstances; providing that a certain determination by the Commissioner of Labor and Industry does not preclude certain employees from filing a certain action; and providing for the liability of certain contractors and subcontractors under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prevailing Wage Rates - Public Work Contracts - Suits by Employees

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (97-42) (Y: 98 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (31-15) (Y: 32 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 9
2019-03-08SenateReturned Passed
2019-03-07HouseThird Reading Passed (97-42)
2019-03-05HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-05HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-04HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2019-02-27HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters
2019-02-26SenateThird Reading Passed (31-15)
2019-02-22SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-02-22SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-02-21SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2019-02-01SenateHearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-30SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback