MD SB299 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB918
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 723
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 723
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Commission on Trauma-Informed Care to coordinate a statewide initiative to prioritize the trauma-responsive and trauma-informed delivery of State services that impact children, youth, families, and older adults; requiring the Commission to submit its findings annually to the Governor and the General Assembly by June 30; requiring the Commission to study developing a process and framework for implementing an Adverse Childhood Experiences (ACEs) Aware Program in the State; etc.
Title
Human Services - Trauma-Informed Care - Commission and Training (Healing Maryland's Trauma Act)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 723 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2021-04-09 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-09 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2021-03-20 | House | Hearing canceled |
2021-03-17 | House | Hearing 3/23 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {727079/1 Adopted |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2020-10-30 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB918 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
HB548 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 722
HB548 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 722
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Attorney General
Budget and Management, Department of
Child Abuse and Neglect
Children
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Continuing Education
Crime Prev., Youth, and Victim Service, Governor's Office of
Curriculum
Disabilities
Domestic Violence
Education, State Department of
Elderly Persons
Emergencies
Examinations
Federal Government
Governor
Health
Health Care Commission
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Human Services, Department of
Industry and Technology
Injury
Investigations and Inquiries
Job Training
Juvenile Services, Department of
Medical Assistance
meetings
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minors
Municipal Corporations
Natural Resources, Department of
Notices
Planning, Department of
Public Health
Public Works, Board of
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Rural Areas
Social Services
State Police, Department of
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Transportation, Department of
Urban Areas
Work, Labor, and Employment
Attorney General
Budget and Management, Department of
Child Abuse and Neglect
Children
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Continuing Education
Crime Prev., Youth, and Victim Service, Governor's Office of
Curriculum
Disabilities
Domestic Violence
Education, State Department of
Elderly Persons
Emergencies
Examinations
Federal Government
Governor
Health
Health Care Commission
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Human Services, Department of
Industry and Technology
Injury
Investigations and Inquiries
Job Training
Juvenile Services, Department of
Medical Assistance
meetings
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minors
Municipal Corporations
Natural Resources, Department of
Notices
Planning, Department of
Public Health
Public Works, Board of
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Rural Areas
Social Services
State Police, Department of
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Transportation, Department of
Urban Areas
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Human Services | 8 | 1301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Human Services | 8 | 1302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Human Services | 8 | 1303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Human Services | 8 | 1304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Human Services | 8 | 1305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Human Services | 8 | 1306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Human Services | 8 | 1307 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Human Services | 8 | 1308 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Human Services | 8 | 1309 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Human Services | 8 | 1310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |