MD SB279 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services to implement specified measures and specified automated health care billing systems; requiring the Department to conduct specified reviews of specified claims; requiring the Department to implement health care claims and audit recovery services; authorizing the Department to contract with a vendor to implement specified technologies based on specified reimbursement models; etc.
Title
Correctional Services - Inmate Health Care Services - Billing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Auditors and Audits
Claims
Contracts
Health
Medical Assistance
Prisoners
Public Health
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reimbursement Rates
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Claims
Contracts
Health
Medical Assistance
Prisoners
Public Health
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reimbursement Rates
Telecommunications and Information Technology