MD SB277 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 351
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 351
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Secretary of Transportation to withhold a portion of the State's annual operating grant to the Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority under certain circumstances; requiring the Department of Transportation to provide an annual grant of at least $167,000,000 to pay capital costs of the Authority; requiring the Maryland Transit Administration to prepare a Central Maryland Regional Transit Plan in consultation with certain entities; etc.
Title
Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (97-42) (Y: 98 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (97-42) (Y: 98 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 351 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2018-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (97-42) |
2018-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {374966/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2018-04-05 | House | Hearing 4/05 at 2:30 p.m. (Appropriations) |
2018-04-04 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations and Environment and Transportation |
2018-04-02 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {179435/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Anne Arundel County
Appropriations
Assessments
Auditors and Audits
Baltimore City
Baltimore County
Bridges and Tunnels
Budgets
Buses
Capital Budget
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Commuters
District of Columbia
Driver Education
Excise Tax
Grants
Harford County
Howard County
Interstate Affairs
Mass Transit
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Parking
Pedestrians
Railroads
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Time
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Transportation, Department of
Zoning and Planning
Anne Arundel County
Appropriations
Assessments
Auditors and Audits
Baltimore City
Baltimore County
Bridges and Tunnels
Budgets
Buses
Capital Budget
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Commuters
District of Columbia
Driver Education
Excise Tax
Grants
Harford County
Howard County
Interstate Affairs
Mass Transit
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Parking
Pedestrians
Railroads
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Time
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Transportation, Department of
Zoning and Planning