MD SB257 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-25 - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Pinsky)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Incorporating by reference specified nutrient management plan requirements in the Maryland Nutrient Management Manual of the Department of Agriculture and any supplements to the Manual; establishing specified content and criteria for a nutrient management plan developed for an agricultural operation; providing that a specified agricultural certification does not prevent the application or enforcement of specified provisions of law; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Phosphorus Management Tool

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-25SenateRecommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Pinsky)
2015-03-25SenateFavorable with Amendments
2015-03-18SenateSpecial Order until 3/25 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
2015-03-18SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2015-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments {324534/1
2015-03-16SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2015-02-24SenateHearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
2015-02-04SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback