MD SB231 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-19 - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-19 - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the scope and title of the special wine festival license in Calvert County; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners of Calvert County to issue a special beer and wine festival license to the holders of specified alcoholic beverages licenses or to a not-for-profit organization; authorizing the holder of the license to display and sell beer or wine for consumption on or off the licensed premises on specified days and for specified hours; authorizing the Board to approve up to four weekends for an applicant; etc.
Title
Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Beer and Wine Festival License
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-19 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-04 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Calvert County
Fairs
License Commissioners, Boards of
Nonprofit Organizations
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Calvert County
Fairs
License Commissioners, Boards of
Nonprofit Organizations