MD SB230 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 154
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 154
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the age from 55 to 50 years old at which specified individuals may begin to receive benefits under the Length of Service Award Program for Calvert County; altering from $4 to $10 per month an additional amount that is payable under the Program for specified volunteer service; repealing a limit on a maximum benefit payable under the Program; authorizing a specified death benefit to be paid to an alternate beneficiary if a volunteer dies and is unmarried at the time of death; etc.
Title
Calvert County - Length of Service Award Program - Recipient Benefits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 154 |
2015-04-11 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2015-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2015-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-07 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-06 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2015-03-24 | House | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-04 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Calvert County
Counties - Local Laws
Elderly Persons
Fire Protection
Rescue Squads
Volunteers
Work, Labor and Employment
Counties - Local Laws
Elderly Persons
Fire Protection
Rescue Squads
Volunteers
Work, Labor and Employment