MD SB223 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB530

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-15 - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Hearing: Feb 3 @ 1:00 pm Senate Judicial Proceedings Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Increasing, from not more than $8 to not more than $73, the surcharge that the District Court is required to assess per civil case for summary ejectment, tenant holding over, and breach of lease that seeks a judgment for possession of residential property against a residential tenant; requiring the District Court to assess the surcharge against a landlord and prohibiting the court from awarding or assigning the surcharge against a residential tenant; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Landlord and Tenant - Eviction Actions - Filing Surcharge and Prohibited Lease Provisions

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-15SenateHearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2022-01-12SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Same As/Similar To

SB530 (Carry Over) 2021-02-15 - Hearing 2/26 at 2:00 p.m.
HB298 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-19 - First Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Courts and Judicial Proceedings7301(n/a)See Bill Text
Real Property8208(n/a)See Bill Text
Real Property8401(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback