MD SB202 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting, subject to a certain exception, a former secretary of a principal department of the Executive Branch from assisting or representing another party for compensation, for 1 calendar year from the date the secretary leaves State office, in a matter that is the subject of legislative action.
Title
Public Ethics - Executive Branch - Lobbying by Former Secretaries of Principal Departments (Shut the Revolving Door Act of 2020)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-21 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-24 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB315 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 164
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Ethics
Lobbying
Public Officials
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Ethics
Lobbying
Public Officials
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
General Provisions | 5 | 504 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |