MD SB175 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the Board of Public Works from requiring a contractor to furnish certain guarantees before an energy performance contract is ratified; and requiring certain performance bonds, payment bonds, and other securities to be provided at the time of contract ratification.
Title
Procurement - Performance and Payment Security - Requirements and Limitations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | House | Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-01-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/03 at 11:00 a.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-11-01 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Bonds
Contractors
Contracts
Procurement
Public Works, Board of
Revenue and Taxes
Securities
State Government - Procurement
Contractors
Contracts
Procurement
Public Works, Board of
Revenue and Taxes
Securities
State Government - Procurement
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 12 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 13 | 216 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 17 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |