MD SB169 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB335
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-21 - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-21 - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Regulating the use of biometric data by private entities, including by requiring certain private entities in possession of biometric data to develop a written policy, made available to the public, establishing a retention schedule and guidelines for permanent destruction of biometric data; authorizing an individual alleging a violation of the Act to bring a civil action against the offending private entity; and making a violation of the Act an unfair, abusive, or deceptive trade practice.
Title
Commercial Law – Consumer Protection – Biometric Data Privacy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-21 | Senate | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB33 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-01 - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
SB335 (Carry Over) 2022-01-26 - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
SB335 (Carry Over) 2022-01-26 - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Biometrics
Commerce and Business
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Communications
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Courts
Data
Disclosure
Ethics
Fraud
Human Rights
Law Enforcement
Notices
Privacy
Records
Safety
Subpoenas
Time
Unfair Trade Practices
Warrants
Work, Labor, and Employment
Commerce and Business
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Communications
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Courts
Data
Disclosure
Ethics
Fraud
Human Rights
Law Enforcement
Notices
Privacy
Records
Safety
Subpoenas
Time
Unfair Trade Practices
Warrants
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Commercial Law | 13 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 13 | 408 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 14 | 4501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 14 | 4502 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 14 | 4503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 14 | 4504 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 14 | 4505 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 14 | 4506 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0169?ys=2023RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/bills/sb/sb0169f.pdf |