MD SB117 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-22 - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-22 - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Workgroup on Minority Homeownership, Neighborhood Revitalization, and Household Wealth Equity; requiring the Workgroup to study and make recommendations to promote homeownership and create wealth-building opportunities for minority households and promote community revitalization through targeted investments in homeownership; requiring the Workgroup to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 1, 2021; etc.
Title
Workgroup on Minority Homeownership, Neighborhood Revitalization, and Household Wealth Equity
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-22 | Senate | Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-10-14 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB58 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-26 - Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Community Development
Demographics
Foreclosure
Housing
Minorities
Mortgages
Poverty
Real Property
Reimbursement Rates
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Sunset
Tax Sales
Community Development
Demographics
Foreclosure
Housing
Minorities
Mortgages
Poverty
Real Property
Reimbursement Rates
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Sunset
Tax Sales
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0117?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0117f.pdf |