MD HB58 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-26 - Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Workgroup on Minority Homeownership, Neighborhood Revitalization, and Household Wealth Equity; requiring the Workgroup to study and make recommendations to promote homeownership and create wealth-building opportunities for minority households and promote community revitalization through targeted investments in homeownership; requiring the Workgroup to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 1, 2021; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workgroup on Minority Homeownership, Neighborhood Revitalization, and Household Wealth Equity

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-26HouseHearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
2020-10-14HousePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

SB117 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-22 - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback