MD SB1087 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-02 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-02 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that each county distribute a specified minimum amount of money that the county receives from the Senator William H. Amoss Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Fund to volunteer fire, rescue, and ambulance companies; requiring the Director of the Maryland Emergency Management Agency to submit an annual report to the General Assembly on the amount of money distributed by each county to volunteer companies; requiring each county to include specified information in a specified report; etc.
Title
Local Government - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Funds - Distribution of Money to
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-02 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2012-04-01 | Third Reading Passed (46-1) | |
2012-03-31 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-31 | Favorable with Amendments 479930/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-04-06 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2012-03-16 | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-09 | Re-referred Budget and Taxation | |
2012-03-05 | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Ambulances
Counties
Emergencies
Fire Protection
Local Government Mandates
Reports
Rescue Squads
Revenue and Taxes
State Aid
Volunteers
Ambulances
Counties
Emergencies
Fire Protection
Local Government Mandates
Reports
Rescue Squads
Revenue and Taxes
State Aid
Volunteers