MD SB1056 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that certain fees and surcharges on the recordation of instruments among the land records do not apply to the recordation of a certain restrictive covenant modification or an amendment to the common area deeds or other declarations of a homeowners association that deletes a covenant or restriction that restricts ownership based on race, religious belief, or national origin in accordance with certain provisions of law; repealing a deadline of September 30, 2019, for the governing body to delete certain restrictions; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Real Property - Deletion of Unlawful Ownership Restrictions - Exemption From Fees and Surcharges

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-04SenateHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-03-02SenateRereferred to Judicial Proceedings
2020-02-24SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Same As/Similar To

HB1077 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 421

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Courts and Judicial Proceedings13604(n/a)See Bill Text
Real Property11B113.3(n/a)See Bill Text
Real Property3601(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback