MD SB1056 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that certain fees and surcharges on the recordation of instruments among the land records do not apply to the recordation of a certain restrictive covenant modification or an amendment to the common area deeds or other declarations of a homeowners association that deletes a covenant or restriction that restricts ownership based on race, religious belief, or national origin in accordance with certain provisions of law; repealing a deadline of September 30, 2019, for the governing body to delete certain restrictions; etc.
Title
Real Property - Deletion of Unlawful Ownership Restrictions - Exemption From Fees and Surcharges
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2020-02-24 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Same As/Similar To
HB1077 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 421
Subjects
Clerks of Court
Discrimination
Fees
Homeowners Associations
Human Relations
Land Records
Real Property
Recordation
Discrimination
Fees
Homeowners Associations
Human Relations
Land Records
Real Property
Recordation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 13 | 604 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 11B | 113.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 3 | 601 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB1056?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sb/sb1056f.pdf |