MD SB105 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB115
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-10 - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-10 - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Governor's Office of Crime Prevention, Youth, and Victim Services to study and report on the compensation and benefits of law enforcement officers in the State; requiring certain units of State government to provide assistance to the Office by providing information necessary to conduct the study; and requiring the Office to submit its report to certain committees of the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2023.
Title
Law Enforcement Officers - Compensation and Benefits - Study
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-10 | Senate | Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-11 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2022-11-16 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB115 (Carry Over) 2022-03-29 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Subjects
Crime Prev., Youth, and Victim Service, Governor's Office of
Data
Disclosure
Law Enforcement
Records
Reports
Salaries and Compensation
State Government - Pensions and Retirement
studies
Data
Disclosure
Law Enforcement
Records
Reports
Salaries and Compensation
State Government - Pensions and Retirement
studies
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0105?ys=2023RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/bills/sb/sb0105f.pdf |