MD SB105 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 465
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 465
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "nonprofit training entity" for the purposes of the Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program to include an entity that uses trained therapy horses for interaction with veterans; altering the definition of "eligible veteran" to include veterans who receive treatment or care from a U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs or U.S. Department of Defense medical facility in the State; altering the duties of a nonprofit training entity selected under the Program; etc.
Title
Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program - Therapy Horses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-0) (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 465 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-03-25 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-0) |
2019-03-22 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-22 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-21 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-03-12 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {954535/1 Report Adopted |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Animals
Armed Forces
Comptroller
Data
Death
Dogs
Federal Government
Fees
Gifts
internet
Investments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Names
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Salaries and Compensation
Social Services - Generally
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Veterans
Animals
Armed Forces
Comptroller
Data
Death
Dogs
Federal Government
Fees
Gifts
internet
Investments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Names
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Salaries and Compensation
Social Services - Generally
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Veterans