MD SB1022 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 593
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 593
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Board of Regents of the University System of Maryland to grant a tuition waiver, in an amount not to exceed the amount of the tuition obligation, to a student member of the Board serving in the second year of a two-year term; prohibiting the tuition waiver from being considered a gift or compensation under certain State laws; prohibiting a student member receiving the tuition waiver from being classified as an employee of the University System of Maryland; etc.
Title
Board of Regents of the University System of Maryland – Tuition Waiver – Student Members
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 126 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (Y: 125 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (Y: 125 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 593 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (126-5) |
2020-03-18 | House | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (125-7) |
2020-03-18 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-18 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2020-03-15 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Floor Amendment {873028/1 (Senator Elfreth) Adopted |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2020-02-13 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Gifts
Higher Education
Salaries and Compensation
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Tuition
Work, Labor and Employment
Gifts
Higher Education
Salaries and Compensation
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Tuition
Work, Labor and Employment