MD HB981 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-26 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 834
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the definition of "campaign material" to include certain material that is disseminated and certain qualifying paid digital communications; altering the definition of "public communication" to include certain qualifying paid digital communications that require a person who makes independent expenditures of a certain amount to file an independent expenditure report with the State Board; requiring, under certain circumstances, an online platform to apply for a compliance waiver before receiving certain payment; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Online Electioneering Transparency and Accountability Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-1) (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (94-38) (Y: 95 N: 39 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (101-36) (Y: 102 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-26HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 834
2018-04-05HousePassed Enrolled
2018-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed (94-38)
2018-04-05HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2018-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (44-1)
2018-04-02SenateFloor Amendment {793929/1 (Senator Zucker) Adopted
2018-03-30SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-30SenateFloor Amendment {743923/1 (Senator Zucker) Adopted
2018-03-30SenateFavorable with Amendments {134534/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-29SenateLaid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
2018-03-29SenateFavorable with Amendments {134534/1
2018-03-29SenateSpecial Order until later today (Senator Zucker) Adopted
2018-03-29SenateFavorable with Amendments {134534/1
2018-03-29SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-16SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-16HouseThird Reading Passed (101-36)
2018-03-16HouseMotion vote previous question (Delegate Ebersole) Adopted
2018-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-14HouseSpecial Order until next session (Delegate Impallaria) Adopted
2018-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {905669/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2018-02-20HouseHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-05HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0981&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0981f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0981t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0981e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_834_hb0981e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0001/hb0981_90566901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0001/hb0981_13453401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0001/hb0981_74392301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0001/hb0981_79392901.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0001/hb0981.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0981_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0505.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0981_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1027.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1136.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback