MD HB969 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 309
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 309
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing training requirements for members of the State Board of Dental Examiners; and establishing and codifying Board disciplinary processes related to the issuance of final decisions and summary suspensions of licenses by the Board.
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners - Training and Disciplinary Processes - Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 309 |
2022-04-11 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (41-0) |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2022-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {883529/1 Adopted |
2022-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-02-14 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-10 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB611 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 310
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Dental Hygienists
Dentists
Discipline
Health
Health Occupations
Job Training
Licenses
Notices
Safety
Work, Labor, and Employment
Committees and Commissions
Dental Hygienists
Dentists
Discipline
Health
Health Occupations
Job Training
Licenses
Notices
Safety
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health Occupations | 4 | 202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 4 | 205 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 4 | 318 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 4 | 318.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |