MD HB952 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring an applicant for a specified permit for the hydraulic fracturing of a well for the exploration or production of natural gas to submit specified information to the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene in a specified manner; establishing the Hydraulic Fracturing Chemical Education and Impact Fund for specified purposes; requiring the Department to establish a specified fee by regulation; establishing a specified civil penalty for specified violations; etc.
Title
Public Health - Hydraulic Fracturing Chemicals - Information and Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn |
2015-03-11 | House | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-16 | House | Reassigned to Environment and Transportation |
2015-02-13 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Disclosure
Education
Environment
Environmental Health
Fees
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Hospitals
Laboratories
Licenses
Patients
Penalties and Sentences
Physicians
Privacy
Public Health
Records
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Wells
Disclosure
Education
Environment
Environmental Health
Fees
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Hospitals
Laboratories
Licenses
Patients
Penalties and Sentences
Physicians
Privacy
Public Health
Records
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Wells