MD HB919 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-11)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 288
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-11)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 288
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the legislative body of a local jurisdiction to adopt, modify, remand or disapprove a specified plan or part of a plan, a plan for one or more geographic sections or divisions of the local jurisdiction, or an amendment to the plan; authorizing and requiring the legislative body to hold a public hearing before taking specified actions; requiring a planning commission to hold a public hearing before submitting a new recommended plan under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Land Use - Plans - Development and Adoption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (38-9) (Y: 38 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-2) (Y: 135 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-2) (Y: 135 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 288 |
2015-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (38-9) |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-16 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-2) |
2015-03-11 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments {670814/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2015-03-03 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-13 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Hearings
Laws and Ordinances
Local Government - Generally
Municipal Corporations
Public Information
Zoning and Planning
Counties
Hearings
Laws and Ordinances
Local Government - Generally
Municipal Corporations
Public Information
Zoning and Planning