MD HB915 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-13 - Referred Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-13 - Referred Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Uninsured Employers' Fund to begin paying compensation for a workers' compensation claim within 15 days after the later of the date an award is made or payment of an award is due; applying certain provisions of law regarding the failure to timely pay awards to the Fund; and applying the Act prospectively.
Title
Workers’ Compensation – Uninsured Employers’ Fund – Timely Payment of Awards
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 103 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2024-03-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (103-35) |
2024-03-08 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-07 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2024-02-06 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-02 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB789 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-02 - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Labor and Employment | 9 | 727 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 9 | 728 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 9 | 741 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |