MD HB907 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the limit on the number of licenses that the Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission may issue to medical cannabis growers; etc.
Title
Medical Cannabis – Limit on the Number of Licensed Growers – Repeal
Sponsors
Del. Dan Morhaim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | House | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2018-03-13 | House | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-15 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-06 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Agriculture
Cannabis
Care Giver
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Drugs
Emergency Bills
Health
Laboratories
Licenses
Patients
Public Health
Cannabis
Care Giver
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Drugs
Emergency Bills
Health
Laboratories
Licenses
Patients
Public Health