MD HB900 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 74
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 74
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the Maryland Department of Health and local health departments from collecting fees for certified or abridged copies of death certificates for first responders killed in the line of duty if the copy is provided to the first responder's surviving spouse or child for a certain purpose.
Title
Death Certificates - Fees - First Responders Killed in the Line of Duty
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 74 |
2022-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2022-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-0) |
2022-03-18 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-18 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 3:00 p.m. |
2022-03-09 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-02-15 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Death
Emergency Medical Services
Fees
Fire Protection
Law Enforcement
Public Health
Rescue Squads
Vital Records
Emergency Medical Services
Fees
Fire Protection
Law Enforcement
Public Health
Rescue Squads
Vital Records
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 18 | 213.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 4 | 217 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |