MD HB899 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-16 - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-16 - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting, in Harford County, the Board of License Commissioners from requiring applications for certain temporary licenses to include copies of a catering contract or menu for the licensed event, the signature of the owner of the property where the licensed event is to be held, or a notarized application.
Title
Harford County - Board of License Commissioners - Temporary License Application
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-16 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2018-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {963099/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2018-02-19 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Commerce and Business
Contracts
Food
Harford County
License Commissioners, Boards of
Notaries Public
Real Property
Signatures
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Commerce and Business
Contracts
Food
Harford County
License Commissioners, Boards of
Notaries Public
Real Property
Signatures