MD HB865 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB373
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-05 - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-05 - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Howard County Board of Education to bear the burden of proof in due process proceedings that initiate from a due process complaint regarding the provision of special education services or a program for a child with disabilities in Howard County except under certain circumstances.
Title
Howard County – Due Process Proceedings for Children With Disabilities – Burden of Proof Ho. Co. 02-22
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | Senate | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Hearing 4/05 at 1:15 p.m. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2022-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {743725/1 Adopted |
2022-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2022-02-08 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
HB865 (Carry Over) 2022-04-05 - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Disabilities
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Howard County
Minors
Parents and Guardians
Private Schools
Public Schools
Records
Special Education
Students
Sunset
Tuition
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Howard County
Minors
Parents and Guardians
Private Schools
Public Schools
Records
Special Education
Students
Sunset
Tuition