MD HB843 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 79
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the Department of Human Services to disclose a report or record concerning child abuse or neglect with local or State officials responsible for the administration of juvenile services under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Human Services - Child Abuse and Neglect - Disclosure of Information

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 79
2019-04-08HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-05SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-04SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-27SenateHearing 4/02 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-03-26SenateRereferred to Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2019-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-15HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-15HouseFavorable Report by Judiciary
2019-02-08HouseHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback