MD HB838 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-07 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-07 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that a specified form developed by the State Real Estate Commission in connection with the sale of residential real property state the possibility of significant differences in the property tax bill previously paid by the seller of the property and the property tax bill of the buyer of the property.
Title
Residential Real Property Sales - Property Tax Disclaimer
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-07 | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-03-23 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-03-20 | Third Reading Passed (140-0) | |
2011-03-18 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-18 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-17 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters | |
2011-02-11 | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-11 | First Reading Environmental Matters |