MD HB834 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-30 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-30 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Last Dollar Scholarship; establishing specified application requirements; authorizing the use of the Scholarship for specified costs at specified institutions of higher education subject to a specified limitation; limiting the Scholarship to a maximum of $3,000 per academic year; authorizing the Scholarship to be renewed for up to an additional 4 years under specified circumstances; and requiring the Governor to appropriate at least $1,000,000 in the State budget to provide specified scholarships.
Title
Higher Education - Last Dollar Scholarship - Established
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-30 | House | Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn |
2016-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-12 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2016-03-03 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-08 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Governor
Higher Education
Public Schools
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
State Universities and Colleges
Budgets
Governor
Higher Education
Public Schools
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
State Universities and Colleges