MD HB829 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring that a traffic citation issued to a person contain a notice that, if the citation is a payable violation, the person must comply with one of a list of options within 30 days, including the option to request a trial date at the date, time, and place established by the District Court by writ or trial notice; requiring the notice to include a statement of the possible consequences if the person fails to comply within 30 days; authorizing the District Court or circuit court to issue a warrant under specified circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle Laws - Traffic Citations - Option to Request Trial

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-04 Approved by the Governor
2010-04-07 Third Reading Passed (43-0)
2010-04-06 Second Reading Passed
2010-04-06 Favorable Report Adopted
2010-04-09 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2010-03-26 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
2010-04-07 Returned Passed
2010-03-24 Third Reading Passed (140-1)
2010-03-23 Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2010-03-23 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
2010-03-26 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2010-02-09 Hearing 3/3 at 1:00 p.m.
2010-02-09 First Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback