MD HB812 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-14 - Motion Recommit to Committee (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Awarding a diminution credit of 90 days to reduce the term of confinement of an inmate if the inmate successfully obtains a certain educational certificate, diploma, or degree; prohibiting an inmate who is serving a certain sexual offense from receiving the diminution credit; requiring the Commissioner of Correction to establish a uniform system of deductions and participation criteria for awarding a certain diminution credit; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Correctional Services - Diminution Credits - Education

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseMotion Recommit to Committee (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted
2020-03-13HouseMotion Special Order until 3/14 (Delegate T. Branch) Adopted
2020-03-11HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-11HouseFavorable Report by Judiciary
2020-02-04HouseHearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-03HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

SB922 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-16 - Referred Judiciary

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Correctional Services3706.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Correctional Services3708(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback