MD SB397 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB812
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-12 - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-12 - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Awarding a diminution credit of 60 days per program completed to reduce the term of confinement of an inmate if the inmate successfully obtains a certain educational certificate, diploma, or degree; requiring the Commissioner of Correction to establish a uniform system of deductions and participation criteria; prohibiting a certain inmate from being awarded more than 40 days of diminution credit; prohibiting a certain inmate from receiving a diminution credit under the Act; etc.
Title
Correctional Services - Diminution Credits - Education
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Carter [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {868879/1 Adopted |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Waldstreicher) Adopted |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {868879/1 |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-15 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB89 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 365
HB812 (Carry Over) 2020-03-14 - Motion Recommit to Committee (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted
HB812 (Carry Over) 2020-03-14 - Motion Recommit to Committee (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted
Subjects
Correction, Division of
Criminal Law - Procedure
Education
Higher Education
Job Training
Penalties and Sentences
Prisoners
Sexual Offenses
Violence
Criminal Law - Procedure
Education
Higher Education
Job Training
Penalties and Sentences
Prisoners
Sexual Offenses
Violence
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Correctional Services | 3 | 706.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Correctional Services | 3 | 708 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |