MD HB801 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-09 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-09 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the purpose and use of the State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund; requiring the Governor, beginning in fiscal year 2020 and each fiscal year thereafter, to include in the annual budget bill an appropriation of $1,000,000 to the Fund; requiring the Department of Natural Resources to report to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 1, 2021, on the status of the Fund and any recommendations for the fund; and providing for the termination of the Act.
Title
State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund - Purpose, Use, and Funding - Alterations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2018-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2018-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {980210/2 Report Adopted |
2018-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-02-21 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-01 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Governor
Natural Resources
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rivers, Streams, and Lakes
Sunset
Budgets
Governor
Natural Resources
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rivers, Streams, and Lakes
Sunset