MD HB801 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that if an individual who was a member of one of the several systems in the State Retirement and Pension System on June 30, 2011, becomes a member of another one of the several systems on or after July 1, 2011, the individual shall be considered to be a new member of the subsequent system as of the date the individual joins the system, and is subject to the same requirements to which an individual who was a member of the subsequent system on June 30, 2011, and remains a member on July 1, 2011, is subject; etc.
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Transfer of Members Between Systems
Sponsors
Del. John Bohanan [D] | Del. Galen Clagett [D] | Sen. Melony Griffith [D] | Del. Keith Haynes [D] |
Del. James Proctor [D] | Sen. Barbara Robinson [D] | Del. Theodore Sophocleus [D] | Sen. Craig Zucker [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-04-01 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2012-03-30 | Special Order until 4/6 (Senator Jones-Rodwell) Adopted | |
2012-03-27 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-27 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-02 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2012-03-28 | Hearing 3/29 at 9:00 a.m. | |
2012-03-20 | First Reading Budget and Taxation | |
2012-04-03 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-19 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | |
2012-03-18 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-18 | Favorable with Amendments 504166/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-21 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations | |
2012-02-15 | Hearing 2/28 at 1:30 p.m. | |
2012-02-09 | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Correctional Officers
Law Enforcement
Public Employees
Retirement Systems
State Employees
State Police, Department of
Teachers
Law Enforcement
Public Employees
Retirement Systems
State Employees
State Police, Department of
Teachers