MD HB790 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 78
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 78
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that the Small Business Reserve Program includes certain veteran-owned small business enterprises that meet certain criteria; requiring the Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs to adopt regulations to establish a certain overall percentage goal of certain procurement contracts to be made with veteran-owned small business enterprises; requiring certain solicitation documents to include certain information; altering the required contents of a certain annual report; etc.
Title
Procurement – Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs – Small Business Reserve Program and Veteran–Owned Small Business Enterprise Program
Sponsors
Del. Pat Young [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 78 |
2021-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2021-03-20 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-20 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2021-02-12 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-29 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB598 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 79
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Investigations and Inquiries
Minorities
Procurement
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Small Business
Solicitation
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Government - Procurement
Veterans
Contracts
Investigations and Inquiries
Minorities
Procurement
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Small Business
Solicitation
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Government - Procurement
Veterans
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 14 | 501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 14 | 601 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 14 | 602 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 14 | 603 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 14 | 604 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 14 | 604.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |