MD SB598 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 79
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 79
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that the Small Business Reserve Program includes certain veteran-owned small business enterprises that meet certain criteria; requiring the Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs to adopt regulations to establish a certain overall percentage goal of certain procurement contracts to be made with veteran-owned small business enterprises; requiring certain solicitation documents to include certain information; altering the required contents of a certain annual report; etc.
Title
Procurement – Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs – Small Business Reserve Program and Veteran–Owned Small Business Enterprise Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 79 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-03-29 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2021-03-25 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-24 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2021-03-20 | House | Hearing canceled |
2021-03-17 | House | Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-03-10 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {904035/1 Adopted |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB790 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 78
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Investigations and Inquiries
Minorities
Procurement
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Small Business
Solicitation
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Government - Procurement
Veterans
Contracts
Investigations and Inquiries
Minorities
Procurement
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Small Business
Solicitation
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Government - Procurement
Veterans
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 14 | 501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 14 | 601 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 14 | 602 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 14 | 603 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 14 | 604 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 14 | 604.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |