MD HB783 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-19 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-19 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a debt collector from attempting to collect a debt unless the debt collector possesses specified verifiable information; requiring a specified affidavit to meet specified requirements; prohibiting supporting documents in a civil action, including affidavits, from being created solely for the purpose of filing a civil action; prohibiting an original creditor from selling a specified debt; requiring an original creditor to provide specified documentation to a debt buyer; etc.
Title
Consumer Protection - Collection and Sale of Consumer Debt - Restrictions
Sponsors
Del. Ana Gutierrez [D] | Del. Alfred Carr [D] | Del. Bonnie Cullison [D] | Del. Eric Luedtke [D] |
Del. David Moon [D] | Del. Marice Morales [D] | Del. Joseline Pena-Melnyk [D] | Sen. William Smith [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-19 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters |
2016-03-02 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-11 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2016-02-24 | House | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-08 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Armed Forces
Civil Actions
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation
Consumer Protection
Death
Debt Collection
Debt Management
Loans
Notices
Signatures
Civil Actions
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation
Consumer Protection
Death
Debt Collection
Debt Management
Loans
Notices
Signatures