MD HB775 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 253
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 253
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Maryland Pediatric Cancer Fund to be used only for pediatric cancer research, prevention, and treatment; requiring the Secretary of Health to adopt regulations to implement a pediatric cancer research grant program; requiring the Governor in fiscal year 2023 to include in the annual budget bill an appropriation of $5,000,000 for the Fund; providing that if the $5,000,000 is not included in the fiscal year 2023 appropriation, then the Governor is required to include it in the fiscal year 2024 budget bill; etc.
Title
Maryland Pediatric Cancer Fund - Establishment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 253 |
2022-04-11 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2022-04-11 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {663821/1 Adopted |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance) |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Finance Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2022-03-19 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-19 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-02-23 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 2:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) |
2022-02-03 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations and Ways and Means |
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Diseases
Gifts
Governor
Grants
Health, Department of
Income Tax
Medical Research
Minors
Public Health
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Tax Returns
Taxes - Income
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Diseases
Gifts
Governor
Grants
Health, Department of
Income Tax
Medical Research
Minors
Public Health
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Tax Returns
Taxes - Income
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 20 | 120 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 20 | 121 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |