MD HB75 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB232
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-4)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 459
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-4)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 459
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing, from 29 to 30, the number of members of the Maryland Agricultural Commission appointed by the Governor; and requiring the Governor to appoint one member from a list of at least two nominees representing the hemp industry.
Title
Maryland Agricultural Commission - Hemp Industry Member
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 121 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 121 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 459 |
2022-03-31 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-02-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (121-10) |
2022-02-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-02-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {233820/1 Adopted |
2022-02-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2022-01-06 | House | Hearing 1/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2021-09-21 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB232 (Carry Over) 2021-03-10 - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Agriculture | 2 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |