MD HB743 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 558
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 558
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing an exemption from reemployment earnings offsets for retirees of the Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems for certain reemployment from July 1, 2022, through June 30, 2024, for the rehire by each superintendent of a local school system and the superintendent of the Maryland School for the Deaf of a maximum of 25 individuals who are retirees of the Teachers' Retirement System and 25 individuals who are retirees of the Teachers' Pension System.
Title
Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - Reemployment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 558 |
2022-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2022-03-01 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments {933228/1 Adopted |
2022-02-28 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2022-02-03 | House | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-03 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB410 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 559
Subjects
Deaf Persons
Public Schools
Retirement
Salaries and Compensation
School Administration
State Government - Pensions and Retirement
Sunset
Teachers
Time
Work, Labor, and Employment
Public Schools
Retirement
Salaries and Compensation
School Administration
State Government - Pensions and Retirement
Sunset
Teachers
Time
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Personnel and Pensions | 22 | 406 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Personnel and Pensions | 23 | 407 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |