MD HB738 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-7)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 399
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-7)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 399
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a certain provision of law to provide that a general license to practice dental hygiene authorizes the licensee to practice dental hygiene under the general supervision of a licensed dentist in certain facilities, rather than only in a long-term care facility; altering the requirements, to include at least 3,000 hours of active clinical practice in direct patient care, that a dental hygienist is required to meet before being authorized to practice dental hygiene under the general supervision of a licensed dentist in certain facilities; etc.
Title
Dental Hygienist – Scope of Practice – Practice Settings Under General Supervision
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-1) (Y: 138 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-1) (Y: 138 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 399 |
2019-04-04 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-1) |
2019-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {236283/2 Report Adopted |
2019-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Assisted Living
Communications
Contracts
Data
Demographics
Dental Hygienists
Dentists
Disclosure
Electronic Communication
Equipment
Examinations
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Licenses
Long-Term Care
Medical Treatments
Names
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Nursing Homes
Patients
Public Health
Records
Reports
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Time
Communications
Contracts
Data
Demographics
Dental Hygienists
Dentists
Disclosure
Electronic Communication
Equipment
Examinations
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Licenses
Long-Term Care
Medical Treatments
Names
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Nursing Homes
Patients
Public Health
Records
Reports
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Time