MD HB692 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 277
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 277
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the State's Attorney in Carroll County from engaging in the private practice of law.
Title
Carroll County - State's Attorney - Restrictions on Practice
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed 47-0 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 277 |
2022-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed 47-0 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2022-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (123-0) |
2022-03-11 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-10 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2022-02-03 | House | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB906 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 278
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Procedure | 15 | 407 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |