MD HB671 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 473
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 473
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Board of County Commissioners for Garrett County to meet at least twice a month; authorizing the Board to hold public meetings in person or through live video streaming; and prohibiting the Board from meeting solely through live video streaming for more than two consecutive meetings without a formal declaration of a state of emergency.
Title
Garrett County - Board of County Commissioners - Meetings
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-07 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 473 |
2023-04-07 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2023-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2023-04-07 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {493920/1 Adopted |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2023-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {503226/1 Adopted |
2023-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2023-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB524 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 474
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Garrett County | 30.03 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |