MD HB669 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 387
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 387
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the qualifications for a real estate appraisal license and for a certificate for residential or general real estate appraisal to include completion of certain criteria in the Practical Applications of Real Estate Appraisal program.
Title
Real Estate Appraisers - Licensing and Certification - Qualifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 387 |
2023-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2023-03-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2023-03-01 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments {443424/1 Adopted |
2023-02-28 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2023-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB455 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 386
Subjects
Appraisals
Business Occupations and Professions
Committees and Commissions
Licenses
Real Estate
Real Property
Business Occupations and Professions
Committees and Commissions
Licenses
Real Estate
Real Property
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Business Occupations and Professions | 16 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |