MD HB648 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Entering into the Interstate Physical Therapy Licensure Compact; stating that the goal of the Compact is to improve public access to physical therapy services; requiring a state to meet certain requirements to participate in the Compact; requiring a physical therapist to meet certain eligibility requirements to receive certain licensure and exercise a certain privilege; authorizing the State Board of Physical Therapy Examiners to charge a fee for granting a compact privilege; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Interstate Physical Therapy Licensure Compact

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-0) (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (43-0)
2019-04-01SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-01SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-14SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-13HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2019-03-12HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments {796088/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-11HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-02-11HouseHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-06HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects

Alternative Dispute Resolution
Archives
Armed Forces
Assessments
Attorneys
Attorneys' Fees
Auditors and Audits
Biometrics
Civil Actions
Claims
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Construction
Court Costs
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Background Investigations
Cybersecurity
Damages
Data
Discipline
Disclosure
Education
Electronic Communication
Electronic Government
Equipment
Ethics
Evidence
Examinations
Expungement
Federal Government
Fees
Fines
Gifts
Health
Health Occupations
Hearings
Industry and Technology
Insurance
internet
Interstate Affairs
Investigations and Inquiries
Job Training
Law Enforcement
Leases and Rent
Liability
Licenses
Mediation
Mortgages
Notices
Open Government
Patients
Penalties and Sentences
Personal Property
Physical Therapists
Prices
Privacy
Real Estate
Real Property
Recordings
Records
Reports
Residency
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Spouses
Subpoenas
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Witnesses
Work, Labor and Employment

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback