MD HB644 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB693
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 413
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 413
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adding Cecil County to a list of counties to which certain riparian laws do not apply; prohibiting a person from placing pound nets to catch fish for commercial use in the waters of the Susquehanna River in Cecil County; and repealing certain fishing restrictions that apply in Cecil County.
Title
Cecil County - Fishing - Restrictions
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 127 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 127 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 413 |
2022-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (127-0) |
2022-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {643027/1 Adopted |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2022-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 2:15 p.m. |
2022-03-09 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 1:25 p.m. |
2022-03-09 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-02-15 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
HB693 (Carry Over) 2021-03-22 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB900 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 414
SB900 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 414
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Natural Resources | 4 | 712 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 4 | 717 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |